TN HB0180 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes certain requirements and procedures to be followed when a patient who is an inpatient at a healthcare facility, or seeking services from emergency department, expresses to a healthcare provider a recent threat or attempt at suicide or infliction of bodily harm to themselves. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 33; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to mental health.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Hall [R] | Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] | Rep. Jason Powell [D] |
Rep. Torrey Harris [D] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 259 | |
2021-04-12 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/23/2021 |
2021-02-16 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2021-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/16/2021 |
2021-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-01-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0615 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-04 - Effective date(s) 7/1/2021