TN SB0615 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective date(s) 7/1/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective date(s) 7/1/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes certain requirements and procedures to be followed when a patient who is an inpatient at a healthcare facility, or seeking services from emergency department, expresses to a healthcare provider a recent threat or attempt at suicide or infliction of bodily harm to themselves. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 33; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to mental health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Effective date(s) 7/1/2021 | |
2021-05-04 | Pub. Ch. 259 | |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-21 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-12 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2021-04-12 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0213) |
2021-04-12 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-08 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0199) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. H&W Comm. 3-31-21 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0180 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 259