TN HB0154 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Pr. Ch. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Pr. Ch. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, authorizes the county to impose a solid waste disposal fee.
Title
AN ACT to create the Chester County solid waste disposal services.
Sponsors
Rep. Kirk Haston [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Pr. Ch. 2 | |
2021-04-07 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-03-31 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-03-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-03-26 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-03-23 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-03-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 6 |
2021-03-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/22/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2021-01-14 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0099 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 2