TN HB0110 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-30 - Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-30 - Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Employment Opportunities for Parents Act." - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Employment Opportunities for Parents Act." - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee |
2019-01-28 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2019-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0550 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee