TN HB0070 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 194
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 194
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises the prohibition against using deadly force in defense of property to specify that prohibition would not apply if a person is justified in using deadly force as otherwise provided by law for defense of oneself or defense of another person.
Title
As enacted, revises the prohibition against using deadly force in defense of property to specify that prohibition would not apply if a person is justified in using deadly force as otherwise provided by law for defense of oneself or defense of another person.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-21 | Pub. Ch. 194 | |
2009-05-21 | Effective date(s) 07/01/09 | |
2009-05-13 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-05-04 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2009-05-04 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-05-04 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-04-30 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2009-04-30 | Passed S., Ayes 29, Nays 0 | |
2009-04-30 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2009-03-23 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2009-03-19 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2009-03-19 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 89, Nays 1 | |
2009-03-19 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0021) | |
2009-03-17 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/19/2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 03/17/2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 03/11/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 3/11/2009 | |
2009-02-25 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 03/04/2009 | |
2009-02-25 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 02/25/2009 | |
2009-02-10 | Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2009-02-09 | Ref. to Judiciary | |
2009-01-14 | P2C held on desk. | |
2009-01-13 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-01-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0474 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 194