TN HB0018 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates exceptions to the offense of open or concealed carrying of a firearm with the intent to go armed for any person legally in possession and not prohibited from possessing a firearm; converts existing defenses to be exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 10; Title 33; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 50 and Title 70.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 10; Title 33; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 50 and Title 70, relative to the carrying of firearms.
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Rep. Todd Warner [R] | Rep. Scotty Campbell [R] | Rep. Clay Doggett [R] |
Rep. Mark Hall [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. Johnny Garrett [R] | Rep. William Lamberth [R] |
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] | Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. Rick Eldridge [R] | Rep. Rusty Grills [R] |
Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Jerry Sexton [R] | Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] |
Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. Andrew Farmer [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] |
Rep. Robin Smith [R] | Rep. Dale Carr [R] | Rep. Kent Calfee [R] | Rep. Rush Bricken [R] |
Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Iris Rudder [R] | Rep. Lowell Russell [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] |
Rep. Ron Gant [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - House - HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2021-03-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/10/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Rec for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/24/2021 |
2021-02-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-01-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-01-13 | House | Ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-01-13 | House | P2C held on desk. |
2021-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2020-12-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2020-12-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2020-12-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0318 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-13 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 1/13/2022