TN SB0318 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 1/13/2022
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates exceptions to the offense of open or concealed carrying of a firearm with the intent to go armed for any person legally in possession and not prohibited from possessing a firearm; converts existing defenses to be exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 10; Title 33; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 50 and Title 70.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 10; Title 33; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 50 and Title 70, relative to the carrying of firearms.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 1/13/2022
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021
2021-03-26SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-02-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-22SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0018 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback