TN HB0015 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 53-14)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Pub. Ch. 541
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, creates exemptions from sales tax, registration fee, and motor vehicle privilege tax, for any motor vehicle sold to a veteran or service member who has a service-connected disability and who is eligible for a United States department of veterans affairs automobile grant under the Disabled Veterans' and Servicemen's Automobile Assistance Act of 1970; limits sales and use tax exemption to portion of price that is in excess of the amount of the grant received. - Amends TCA Section 5-8-102; Title 55, Chapter 4 and Title 67, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, creates exemptions from sales tax, registration fee, and motor vehicle privilege tax, for any motor vehicle sold to a veteran or service member who has a service-connected disability and who is eligible for a United States department of veterans affairs automobile grant under the Disabled Veterans' and Servicemen's Automobile Assistance Act of 1970; limits sales and use tax exemption to portion of price that is in excess of the amount of the grant received. - Amends TCA Section 5-8-102; Title 55, Chapter 4 and Title 67, Chapter 6.

Sponsors

Rep. Tilman Goins [R]Rep. Beth Harwell [R]Rep. Jerome Moon [R]Rep. David Alexander [R]
Rep. Paul Sherrell [R]Rep. Debra Moody [R]Rep. Dennis Powers [R]Rep. John Forgety [R]
Rep. Jimmy Eldridge [R]Rep. Jason Zachary [R]Rep. John Crawford [R]Rep. John Windle [D]
Rep. Jeremy Faison [R]Rep. Glen Casada [R]Rep. Harold Love [D]Rep. William Lamberth [R]
Rep. Ron Lollar [R]Rep. Courtney Rogers [R]Rep. Jason Powell [D]Rep. Curtis Johnson [R]
Rep. Susan Lynn [R]Rep. Bill Dunn [R]Rep. Marc Gravitt [R]Rep. Gregory Terry [R]
Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D]Rep. John Ragan [R]Rep. David Byrd [R]Rep. Jerry Sexton [R]
Rep. Bill Sanderson [R]Rep. Bob Ramsey [R]Rep. Jim Coley [R]Rep. Roger Kane [R]
Rep. Mike Stewart [D]Rep. Kelly Keisling [R]Rep. Kent Calfee [R]Rep. Karen Camper [D]
Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D]Rep. Clark Boyd [R]Rep. Ron Travis [R]Rep. G Hardaway [D]
Rep. Johnnie Turner [D]Rep. John Holsclaw [R]Rep. Dan Howell [R]Rep. Michael Curcio [R]
Rep. Timothy Hill [R]Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R]Rep. Kevin Brooks [R]Rep. Thomas Tillis [R]
Rep. David Hawk [R]Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D]Rep. Mark White [R]Rep. Timothy Wirgau [R]
Rep. Sheila Butt [R]Rep. Mike Carter [R]Sen. Dawn White [R]Rep. Gary Hicks [R]
Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D]Rep. Johnny Shaw [D]Rep. Charles Sargent [R]Rep. Tim Rudd [R]
Rep. Curtis Halford [R]Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R]Rep. Larry Miller [D]Rep. Harry Brooks [R]
Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R]Rep. Craig Fitzhugh [D]Rep. Sabi Kumar [R]

Roll Calls

2018-02-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-13 Pub. Ch. 541
2018-03-13 Effective date(s) 03/05/2018
2018-03-05 Signed by Governor.
2018-02-22HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2018-02-22SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-02-22HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-02-16HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2018-02-15SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2018-02-15SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0460)
2018-02-15SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2018-02-07SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2018-02-06HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2018-02-05HousePassed H., Ayes 98, Nays 0, PNV 0
2018-02-05HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-05HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0661)
2018-02-01HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/5/2018
2018-01-31HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/1/2018
2018-01-23HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-01-17HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 1/23/2018
2018-01-17HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-01-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 1/17/2018
2017-05-08HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-05-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017
2017-04-26HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017
2017-03-08HousePlaced behind the budget
2017-03-01HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/8/2017
2017-01-24HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2017-01-12HouseRef. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-01-11HouseP2C held on desk, pending appointment of Standing Committees
2017-01-10HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-01-09HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0010 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 541

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback