TN SB0010 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 541
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, creates exemptions from sales tax, registration fee, and motor vehicle privilege tax, for any motor vehicle sold to a veteran or service member who has a service-connected disability and who is eligible for a United States department of veterans affairs automobile grant under the Disabled Veterans' and Servicemen's Automobile Assistance Act of 1970; limits sales and use tax exemption to portion of price that is in excess of the amount of the grant received. - Amends TCA Section 5-8-102; Title 55, Chapter 4 and Title 67, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, creates exemptions from sales tax, registration fee, and motor vehicle privilege tax, for any motor vehicle sold to a veteran or service member who has a service-connected disability and who is eligible for a United States department of veterans affairs automobile grant under the Disabled Veterans' and Servicemen's Automobile Assistance Act of 1970; limits sales and use tax exemption to portion of price that is in excess of the amount of the grant received. - Amends TCA Section 5-8-102; Title 55, Chapter 4 and Title 67, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-13 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 541
2018-02-15SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-15SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2018-02-13SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/15/2018
2018-01-30SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-05-01SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-18SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0
2017-04-12SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/18/2017
2017-03-06SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2017-02-28SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/6/2017
2017-02-22SenateAction deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/6/2017
2017-02-15SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/22/2017
2017-01-30SenateRefer to Senate Transportation & Safety Committee
2017-01-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments
2017-01-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-01-04SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0015 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-13 - Pub. Ch. 541

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback