TN HB0009 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 572
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 572
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, repeals the Locksmith Licensing Act of 2006. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 11; Title 62, Chapter 35 and Title 62, Chapter 76.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 62, Chapter 11; Title 62, Chapter 35 and Title 62, Chapter 76, relative to the Locksmith Licensing Act of 2006.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 572 | |
2021-05-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-05-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/10/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 2/24/2021 |
2021-02-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2021-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 2/17/2021 |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2021-01-13 | House | Ref. to Commerce Committee |
2021-01-13 | House | P2C held on desk. |
2021-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-11-17 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0012 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 05/27/2021