TN SB0012 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 05/27/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, repeals the Locksmith Licensing Act of 2006. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 11; Title 62, Chapter 35 and Title 62, Chapter 76.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 62, Chapter 11; Title 62, Chapter 35 and Title 62, Chapter 76, relative to the Locksmith Licensing Act of 2006.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 81 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, referred to Finance, Ways & Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-02 Effective date(s) 05/27/2021
2021-06-02 Pub. Ch. 572
2021-05-27SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-05-17SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-05-13HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-05-12SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-05-04HousePassed H., Ayes 81, Nays 9, PNV 0
2021-05-04HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2021-05-04SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-05-04SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2021-05-03SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021
2021-05-03SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2021
2021-04-28SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2021
2021-04-28SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/28/2021
2021-04-27SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/28/2021
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2021
2021-04-22SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/27/21
2021-03-16SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-03-09SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/16/2021
2021-01-13SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2021-01-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-11-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0009 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 572

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback