TN HB0001 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enhances the penalty for destruction or alteration of governmental records from a Class A misdemeanor to a Class E felony. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
As introduced, enhances the penalty for destruction or alteration of governmental records from a Class A misdemeanor to a Class E felony. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2018 |
2017-05-08 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/8/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-02-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/22/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/14/2017 |
2017-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2017-01-12 | House | Ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | P2C held on desk, pending appointment of Standing Committees |
2017-01-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-11-18 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0039 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-17 - Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee