TN SB0039 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enhances the penalty for destruction or alteration of governmental records from a Class A misdemeanor to a Class E felony. - Amends TCA Title 39.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enhances the penalty for destruction or alteration of governmental records from a Class A misdemeanor to a Class E felony. - Amends TCA Title 39.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/17/2018
2018-04-17SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/17/18
2017-05-08SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/9/2017
2017-05-03SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/8/2017
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2017
2017-05-02SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2017
2017-05-01SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017
2017-04-11SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2017-04-05SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/11/2017
2017-02-01SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2017-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-01-12SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0001 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback