SD SB93 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Make an appropriation to rehabilitate the rail line from west of the city of Fort Pierre to the city of Rapid City and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Make an appropriation to rehabilitate the rail line from west of the city of Fort Pierre to the city of Rapid City and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-08 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 57 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Referred as Amended to (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
2021-03-11SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2021 S.J. 476
2021-03-10HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 550
2021-03-09SenateSigned by the President S.J. 465
2021-03-08HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 11. H.J. 513
2021-03-04HouseFirst read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 494
2021-03-03SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 397
2021-03-02JointCommittee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 3.
2021-03-02JointScheduled for hearing J.J. 1
2021-03-01JointScheduled for hearing J.J. 1
2021-02-22JointCommittee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 93E
2021-02-22JointScheduled for hearing J.J. 1
2021-02-05SenateTransportation Referred as Amended to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0.
2021-02-05SenateTransportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 93A
2021-02-05SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-02-03SenatePrime Sponsor Changed at the Request of the Prime Sponsor S.J. 169
2021-01-22SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 96

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback