SD SB204 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Signed by Governor S.J. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Signed by Governor S.J. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the deposit and expenditure of tobacco settlement revenues and bond proceeds.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the deposit and expenditure of tobacco settlement revenues and bond proceeds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-06 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 694 |
2013-03-04 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 634 |
2013-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 598 |
2013-02-27 | House | Signed by President S.J. 615 |
2013-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 2. H.J. 557 |
2013-02-25 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 512 |
2013-02-04 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 283 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 293 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2013-01-30 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 275 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 238 |