SD SB156 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-08 - House of Representatives Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 22, NAYS 45. H.J. 687
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-08 - House of Representatives Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 22, NAYS 45. H.J. 687
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit the employment of unauthorized aliens, and to provide penalties therefor.
Title
Prohibit the employment of unauthorized aliens, and to provide penalties therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 22 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
House - House Motion to strike the "Not" (Y: 36 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Not Pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 22 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
House - House Motion to strike the "Not" (Y: 36 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Not Pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-08 | House of Representatives Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 22, NAYS 45. H.J. 687 | |
2011-03-08 | Intent to reconsider H.J. 684 | |
2011-03-08 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 33, NAYS 35. H.J. 684 | |
2011-03-08 | Motion to strike the "Not", Passed, YEAS 36, NAYS 32. H.J. 670 | |
2011-03-07 | State Affairs Do Not Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. H.J. 650 | |
2011-03-07 | State Affairs Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 10. | |
2011-03-07 | Recalled from committee (Rule 7-7), Passed H.J. 638 | |
2011-03-07 | State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 637 | |
2011-03-07 | State Affairs Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 5, NAYS 8. | |
2011-03-07 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-24 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 514 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 23, NAYS 12. S.J. 507 | |
2011-02-17 | Judiciary Title amended, Passed Amendment 156rtb | |
2011-02-17 | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 464 | |
2011-02-17 | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 156re | |
2011-02-17 | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 156ra | |
2011-02-17 | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 156rb | |
2011-02-17 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-15 | Deferred by Chair | |
2011-02-15 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-27 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 227 |