SD SB132 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 6. H.J. 568
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 6. H.J. 568
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grant limited immunity from arrest and prosecution for certain alcohol consumption related offenses to persons who assist certain persons in need of emergency assistance or who are themselves in need of emergency assistance.
Title
Grant limited immunity from arrest and prosecution for certain alcohol consumption related offenses to persons who assist certain persons in need of emergency assistance or who are themselves in need of emergency assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | House | Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 6. H.J. 568 |
2013-02-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-13 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 369 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 6. S.J. 379 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 364 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 349 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 323 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 168 |