SD SB118 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 521
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Enhance South Dakota.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enhance South Dakota.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-08 - House - House of Representatives: Tabled (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-08HouseHouse of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 521
2021-03-04HouseFirst read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 502
2021-03-01HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 438
2021-02-25SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 357
2021-02-24SenateState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
2021-02-24SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-01-27SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 124

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback