SD HB1316 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Agriculture and Natural Resources Tabled, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Agriculture and Natural Resources Tabled, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise provisions regarding soil health in resource conservation and forestry and conservation districts.
Title
Revise provisions regarding soil health in resource conservation and forestry and conservation districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Jamie Smith [D] | Sen. Shawn Bordeaux [D] | Rep. Linda Duba [D] | Rep. Jennifer Healy Keintz [D] |
Rep. Oren Lesmeister [D] | Sen. Reynold Nesiba [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - Tabled (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Tabled, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-04 | House | Referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 211 |
2022-02-02 | House | First Reading House H.J. 178 |
South Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://sdlegislature.gov/#/Session/Bill/23264 |
Text | https://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/232157.pdf |
Roll Call | https://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/74252 |