SD HB1293 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Limit liability for certain child welfare agency licensees.
Title
Limit liability for certain child welfare agency licensees.
Sponsors
Rep. Erin Healy [D] | Sen. Sydney Davis [R] | Rep. Will Mortenson [R] | Rep. Jess Olson [R] |
Rep. Mike Weisgram [R] | Sen. David Wheeler [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Do Pass (Y: 55 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Do Pass (Y: 55 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 688 |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2022 H.J. 662 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 509 |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 635 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 465 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed S.J. 1 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 1 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 329 |
2022-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 12. H.J. 416 |
2022-02-17 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 3. |
2022-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-04 | House | Referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 211 |
2022-02-02 | House | First Reading House H.J. 178 |