SD HB1277 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 657
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 657
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempt certain capital improvements projects from the required supervision of the Bureau of Administration.
Title
Exempt certain capital improvements projects from the required supervision of the Bureau of Administration.
Sponsors
Rep. Hugh Bartels [R] | Rep. Dan Ahlers [D] | Rep. Taffy Howard [R] | Rep. Chris Karr [R] |
Sen. John Lake [R] | Rep. Mark Mickelson [R] | Sen. Deb Peters [R] | Sen. Justin Cronin [R] |
Sen. Terri Haverly [R] | Sen. Jeff Partridge [R] | Sen. Billie Sutton [D] | Sen. Jim White [R] |
Sen. John Wiik [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Tabled (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 657 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 486 |
2018-02-14 | House | No motion to reconsider H.J. 435 |
2018-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 430 |
2018-02-13 | House | Intent to reconsider H.J. 427 |
2018-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 37, NAYS 28. H.J. 426 |
2018-02-12 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 413 |
2018-02-08 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 391 |
2018-02-07 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 364 |
2018-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-31 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 252 |