SD HB1262 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Signed by the Governor on March 03, 2021 H.J. 478
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Signed by the Governor on March 03, 2021 H.J. 478
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Regulate kratom for those under the age of twenty-one.
Title
Regulate kratom for those under the age of twenty-one.
Sponsors
Rep. Carl Perry [R] | Rep. Kevin Jensen [R] | Sen. Al Novstrup [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 62 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House of Representatives: Motion to amend (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Commerce and Energy: Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 62 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House of Representatives: Motion to amend (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Commerce and Energy: Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 03, 2021 H.J. 478 |
2021-03-01 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 01, 2021 H.J. 434 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 359 |
2021-02-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 391 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 330 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed S.J. 2 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 2 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-17 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 278 |
2021-02-16 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 6. H.J. 296 |
2021-02-16 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 2. H.J. 295 Amendment 1262D |
2021-02-10 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2021-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-08 | House | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1262A |
2021-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 212 |
2021-02-03 | House | First Reading House H.J. 190 |