SD HB1255 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-08 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 13, NAYS 20. S.J. 650
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-08 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 13, NAYS 20. S.J. 650
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the award of joint physical custody of children under certain circumstances.
Title
Provide for the award of joint physical custody of children under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 53 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 53 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-08 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 13, NAYS 20. S.J. 650 | |
2011-03-08 | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 650 Amendment 1255rd | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 640 | |
2011-03-02 | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. S.J. 586 | |
2011-03-02 | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1255rc | |
2011-03-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-24 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 523 | |
2011-02-23 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 16. H.J. 498 | |
2011-02-22 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 483 | |
2011-02-17 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-16 | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 415 | |
2011-02-16 | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1255ra | |
2011-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-01 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 246 |