SD HB1230 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2016 H.J. 874
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2016 H.J. 874
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Require lights on certain animal-drawn vehicles while operating on a highway.
Title
Require lights on certain animal-drawn vehicles while operating on a highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 59 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 59 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2016 H.J. 874 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 08, 2016 H.J. 845 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 555 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 767 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 490 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 466 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 429 |
2016-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 8. H.J. 645 |
2016-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 622 |
2016-02-18 | House | Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. |
2016-02-18 | House | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1230fb |
2016-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-04 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 287 |