SD HB1212 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify the use of force.
Title
Clarify the use of force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6 (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Recalled from committee (Rule 7-7) (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-25 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 61 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6 (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Recalled from committee (Rule 7-7) (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-25 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 61 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 470 |
2021-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2021 H.J. 547 |
2021-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 541 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 21, NAYS 14. S.J. 432 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6, Passed, YEAS 23, NAYS 12. S.J. 432 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Judiciary Report out of committee without recommendation, Passed |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Recalled from committee (Rule 7-7) Senate Judiciary, Passed, YEAS 20, NAYS 14. S.J. 417 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. S.J. 1 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 2, NAYS 4. S.J. 1 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 365 |
2021-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 7. H.J. 421 |
2021-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 420 Amendment 1212C |
2021-02-24 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 1. |
2021-02-24 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1212B |
2021-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-03 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 194 |