SD HB1170 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 H.J. 544
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 H.J. 544
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish mandatory sentences for certain driving while under the influence violations.
Title
Establish mandatory sentences for certain driving while under the influence violations.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Karr [R] | Rep. Mary Fitzgerald [R] | Sen. Brent Hoffman [R] | Rep. Phil Jensen [R] |
Sen. Jim Mehlhaff [R] | Rep. Brian Mulder [R] | Rep. Scott Odenbach [R] | Rep. Marty Overweg [R] |
Rep. Carl Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-06 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 58 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 58 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 H.J. 544 |
2023-03-08 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 08, 2023 H.J. 510 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 458 |
2023-03-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 506 |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 23, NAYS 12. S.J. 427 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-02-22 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 318 |
2023-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 12. H.J. 337 |
2023-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 336 Amendment 1170C |
2023-02-16 | House | Deferred with pending amendment (Rule 5-17), Passed H.J. 321 |
2023-02-15 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. |
2023-02-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-02-13 | House | Referred to House Judiciary, Passed |
2023-02-09 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 277 |
2023-02-08 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 2 |
2023-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-01-26 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 159 |