SD HB1150 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-21 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 12, NAYS 53. H.J. 536
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-21 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 12, NAYS 53. H.J. 536
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require a certain number of crew on a train under certain conditions.
Title
Require a certain number of crew on a train under certain conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-02-15 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-02-15 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 12, NAYS 53. H.J. 536 |
2018-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 535 Amendment 1150oa |
2018-02-20 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 492 |
2018-02-15 | House | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 3. H.J. 473 |
2018-02-15 | House | Transportation Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. |
2018-02-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 173 |