SD HB1137 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-5)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2022 H.J. 668
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-5)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2022 H.J. 668
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation for high performance computing and data storage systems at South Dakota State University and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation for high performance computing and data storage systems at South Dakota State University and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 56 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - Referred to (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 56 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - Referred to (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2022 H.J. 668 |
2022-03-07 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 07, 2022 H.J. 594 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 457 |
2022-03-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 536 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 429 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 328 |
2022-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 14. H.J. 447 |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. H.J. 1 |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 1 Amendment 1137A |
2022-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 2. |
2022-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-26 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 126 |