SD HB1118 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Taxation Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 1. S.J. 532
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revise provisions regarding excise taxes on the purchase price of motor vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise provisions regarding excise taxes on the purchase price of motor vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Taxation Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 48 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27SenateTaxation Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 1. S.J. 532
2019-02-27SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-21SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 457
2019-02-20HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 48, NAYS 17. H.J. 452
2019-02-19HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 442
2019-02-14HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 423
2019-02-13HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 398
2019-02-12HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 382
2019-02-11HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 363
2019-02-06HouseFiscal Note Requested, Passed H.J. 309
2019-01-31HouseTaxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 5. H.J. 277
2019-01-31HouseTaxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1118wa
2019-01-31HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 195

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback