SD HB1093 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 842
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 842
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow the use of dogs to hunt mountain lions and leashed dogs to track and retrieve wounded or presumed dead big game animals.
Title
Allow the use of dogs to hunt mountain lions and leashed dogs to track and retrieve wounded or presumed dead big game animals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 842 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 735 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 655 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 598 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 4. S.J. 613 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 575 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 434 |
2013-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 408 |
2013-02-12 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 349 |
2013-02-12 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1093ta |
2013-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-07 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2013-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-18 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 109 |