SD HB1051 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Signed by the Governor on February 26, 2020 H.J. 418
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Signed by the Governor on February 26, 2020 H.J. 418
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding public access to voter registration data.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding public access to voter registration data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Local Government Deferred to another day (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 44 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Local Government Deferred to another day (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 44 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 26, 2020 H.J. 418 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 21, 2020 H.J. 347 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 297 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 323 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 6. S.J. 244 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 233 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Local Government Deferred to another day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 3. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 2. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-06 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 157 |
2020-02-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 44, NAYS 22. H.J. 183 |
2020-02-04 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. |
2020-02-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-24 | House | Referred to House Local Government H.J. 58 |
2020-01-14 | House | First Reading House H.J. 11 |