SD HB1051 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 478
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 478
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding suspension or debarment of a business by the Bureau of Administration.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding suspension or debarment of a business by the Bureau of Administration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 55 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 55 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House Government Operations and Audit Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House Government Operations and Audit Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 55 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 55 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House Government Operations and Audit Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House Government Operations and Audit Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 478 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1051fa |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1051da |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 249 |
2018-01-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 10. H.J. 185 |
2018-01-24 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 185 Amendment 1051xb |
2018-01-22 | House | Government Operations and Audit Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. H.J. 142 |
2018-01-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-09 | House | First read in House and referred to House Government Operations and Audit H.J. 27 |