SD HB1037 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Signed by the Governor on February 23, 2017 H.J. 482
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Signed by the Governor on February 23, 2017 H.J. 482
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding delegates and alternates to the national convention, nominating petitions, and runoff elections and to revise certain provisions for new political parties.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding delegates and alternates to the national convention, nominating petitions, and runoff elections and to revise certain provisions for new political parties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 23, 2017 H.J. 482 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 16, 2017 H.J. 421 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 406 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 394 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 371 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 343 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 0. S.J. 304 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1037fd |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-01 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 255 |
2017-01-31 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 232 |
2017-01-26 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 218 |
2017-01-25 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 203 |
2017-01-24 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 183 |
2017-01-20 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 92 |
2017-01-20 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1037fb |
2017-01-20 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1037fa |
2017-01-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-10 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 24 |