SD HB1031 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to the Board of Technical Education to construct an advanced manufacturing laboratory space and classrooms on the campus of Lake Area Technical College and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to the Board of Technical Education to construct an advanced manufacturing laboratory space and classrooms on the campus of Lake Area Technical College and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - Referred to (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - Referred to (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 688 |
2022-03-08 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 08, 2022 H.J. 626 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 479 |
2022-03-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 588 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 443 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 380 |
2022-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 4. H.J. 452 |
2022-02-23 | Joint | Scheduled for hearing J.J. 1 |
2022-02-22 | House | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed H.J. 115 |
2022-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. |
2022-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-19 | House | Referred to House Education H.J. 40 |
2022-01-11 | House | First Reading House H.J. 7 |
Subjects
Appropriation
Emergency Clause
Executive/Judiciary Request
Higher Education
Procurement of Public Improvements
Emergency Clause
Executive/Judiciary Request
Higher Education
Procurement of Public Improvements