SD HB1011 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Signed by the Governor on February 22, 2021 H.J. 326
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Increase certain boiler inspection fees and dedicate more of the fees to the state's boiler inspection program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increase certain boiler inspection fees and dedicate more of the fees to the state's boiler inspection program.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy: Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 53 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Commerce and Energy: Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22HouseSigned by the Governor on February 22, 2021 H.J. 326
2021-02-17HouseDelivered to the Governor on February 17, 2021 H.J. 303
2021-02-16SenateSigned by the President S.J. 271
2021-02-11HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 288
2021-02-10SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 241
2021-02-09SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 5
2021-02-09SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-02-01SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 143
2021-01-28HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 13. H.J. 157
2021-01-27HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1.
2021-01-27HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-12HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 11

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback