SC S981 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Act No. 267

Summary

AN ACT TO AMEND SECTION 63-3-530, CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, RELATING TO THE JURISDICTION OF THE FAMILY COURT, INCLUDING JURISDICTION TO ORDER VISITATION FOR GRANDPARENTS, SO AS TO PROVIDE THAT THE COURT MAY ORDER GRANDPARENT VISITATION IF THE COURT FINDS THAT THE CHILD'S PARENTS ARE UNREASONABLY DEPRIVING THE GRANDPARENT VISITATION WITH THE CHILD AND HAVE DENIED VISITATION FOR MORE THAN NINETY DAYS, THAT THE GRANDPARENT MAINTAINED A RELATIONSHIP WITH THE CHILD SIMILAR TO A PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP, THAT AWARDING VISITATION WOULD NOT INTERFERE WITH THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP, AND THAT THE PARENTS ARE UNFIT OR THAT THERE ARE COMPELLING CIRCUMSTANCES TO OVERCOME THE PRESUMPTION THAT THE PARENTAL DECISION IS IN THE CHILD'S BEST INTEREST; TO AUTHORIZE THE JUDGE TO AWARD ATTORNEY'S FEES TO THE PREVAILING PARTY; AND TO DEFINE "GRANDPARENT". - ratified title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide That The Court May Order Grandparent Visitation If The Court Finds That The Child's Parents Are Unreasonably Depriving The Grandparent Visitation With The Child And Have Denied Visitation For More Than Ninety Days, That The Grandparent Maintained A Relationship With The Child Similar To A Parent-child Relationship, That Awarding Visitation Would Not Interfere With The Parent-child Relationship, And That The Parents Are Unfit Or That There Are Compelling Circumstances To Overcome The Presumption That The Parental Decision Is In The Child's Best Interest; To Authorize The Judge To Award Attorney's Fees To The Prevailing Party; And To Define "grandparent". - Ratified Title

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-08 Act No. 267
2010-07-01 Effective date 06/24/10
2010-06-24 Signed By Governor
2010-06-21 Ratified R 342
2010-06-15 Roll call Yeas-112 Nays-0 HJ-106
2010-06-15 Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled HJ-106
2010-06-03 Returned to House with amendments SJ-55
2010-06-03 House amendment amended SJ-55
2010-05-28 Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments HJ-1
2010-05-27 Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day HJ-37
2010-05-27 Roll call Yeas-96 Nays-0 HJ-35
2010-05-27 Read second time HJ-35
2010-05-27 Amended
2010-05-26 Debate adjourned until Thursday, May 27, 2010 HJ-19
2010-05-26 Debate adjourned HJ-17
2010-05-25 Debate adjourned until Wednesday, May 26, 2010 HJ-41
2010-05-19 Recalled from Committee on Judiciary HJ-46
2010-05-12 Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-78
2010-05-12 Introduced and read first time HJ-78
2010-05-12 Read third time and sent to House SJ-19
2010-04-22 Read second time SJ-43
2010-04-22 Committee Amendment Adopted SJ-43
2010-02-17 Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary SJ-13
2010-01-20 Referred to Subcommittee: Campbell (ch), Knotts, Campsen, Lourie
2010-01-12 Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-44
2010-01-12 Introduced and read first time SJ-44
2009-12-09 Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2009-12-09 Prefiled

Same As/Similar To

S1044 (Similar To) 2010-01-20 - Referred to Subcommittee: Campbell (ch), Knotts, Campsen, Lourie
H3165 (Similar To) 2009-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-74
H3412 (Similar To) 2010-03-03 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: M.A.Pitts

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
633530(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback