SC H3165 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-74
Pending: House Judiciary Committee

Summary

A BILL TO AMEND SECTION 63-3-530, CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, RELATING TO THE JURISDICTION OF THE FAMILY COURT, INCLUDING JURISDICTION TO ORDER VISITATION FOR GRANDPARENTS, SO AS TO PROVIDE THAT IF THE COURT FINDS THAT THE CHILD'S PARENTS ARE DEPRIVING THE GRANDPARENT VISITATION WITH THE CHILD AND THAT IT IS IN THE CHILD'S BEST INTEREST TO HAVE VISITATION WITH THE GRANDPARENT, THE COURT MAY ORDER VISITATION UNDER CERTAIN CIRCUMSTANCES.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide That If The Court Finds That The Child's Parents Are Depriving The Grandparent Visitation With The Child And That It Is In The Child's Best Interest To Have Visitation With The Grandparent, The Court May Order Visitation Under Certain Circumstances.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-01-13 Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-74
2009-01-13 Introduced and read first time HJ-74
2008-12-16 Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2008-12-16 Prefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0981 (Similar To) 2010-07-08 - Act No. 267
S1044 (Similar To) 2010-01-20 - Referred to Subcommittee: Campbell (ch), Knotts, Campsen, Lourie
H3412 (Similar To) 2010-03-03 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: M.A.Pitts

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
633530(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback