SC S1178 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
Express Sincere Gratitude To The Participating Restaurants And Sponsors Of The South Carolina Restaurant And Lodging Association's Annual Hospitality Day Legislative Luncheon And To Recognize Wednesday, April 24, 2024, As "hospitality Day" In South Carolina.
Title
Hospitality Day Naming
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-03-20 | House | Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Introduced, adopted, sent to House |