SC S0955 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - Debate adjourned
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - Debate adjourned
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 50-5-400 So As To Establish The Limited Commercial Blue Crab License And The Requirements For Obtaining The License; By Amending Section 50-5-325, Relating To Commercial Equipment Licenses And Fees, So As To Revise The Fee Structure For The Commercial Trap License; By Amending Section 50-5-350, Relating To The Transferability Of Licenses, So As To Exempt The Limited Commercial Blue Crab License From The General Transfer Prohibition; By Amending Section 50-5-360, Relating To Licenses To Engage In Shedding Peeler Crabs, So As To Require That An Applicant's Or Licensee's Business Premises Be Capable Of Peeler Shedding Operations; By Amending Section 50-5-545, Relating To Traps For Taking Blue Crab, So As To Provide For The Material, Dimensions, And Escape Vent Requirements Of The Traps; By Adding Section 50-5-1302 So As To Establish A Recreational Limit Of One-half Bushel Of Blue Crabs Per Person Per Day Not To Exceed One Bushel Per Boat; By Adding Section 50-5-1345 So As To Prohibit The Use Of Crab Traps In The Waters Of This State From January 16 Through January 29 Of Each Year; By Amending Section 50-5-330, Relating To Recreational Equipment Limits, So As To Increase The Number Of Traps That May Be Used For Recreational Purposes From Two To Ten With A Recreational Crab Trap Endorsement; And By Amending Section 50-9-540, Relating To Recreational Saltwater Fishing Licenses So As To Provide For The Cost Of The Recreational Crab Trap Endorsement.
Title
Blue Crabs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-08 | House | Debate adjourned |
2024-05-07 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2024-05-06 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-05-01 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2024-04-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2024-04-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2024-04-04 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Amended |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2024-03-21 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Fish, Game and Forestry |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H4386 (Similar To) 2024-07-17 - Act No. 212
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 5 | 1302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 5 | 1345 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 5 | 325 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 5 | 330 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 5 | 350 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 5 | 360 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 5 | 400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 5 | 545 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 9 | 540 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |