SC S0813 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating To Personal Income Tax Rates, To Reduce The Number Of Tax Brackets From Five Brackets To Three, Including A Three Percent Bracket, A Five Percent Bracket, And A Seven Percent Bracket, To Provide That The New Brackets Are Effective For Tax Year 2019 And Succeeding Years, And To Provide For A Five Year Phase In Of Expanded Income Ranges Within Each Bracket Beginning With Tax Year 2019; And To Amend Section 12-6-520, Relating To Annual Inflation Adjustments To Individual State Income Tax Brackets, To Conform With The New Brackets And Income Ranges Within The Brackets.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax rates

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced and read first time
2017-12-06SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2017-12-06SenatePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0054 (Similar To) 2017-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Finance
S0384 (Similar To) 2017-02-08 - Referred to Committee on Finance
S0600 (Similar To) 2017-03-30 - Referred to Committee on Finance
H3516 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - Act No. 40

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
126510(n/a)See Bill Text
126520(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback