SC H3516 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Act No. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Make A Conforming Change

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SC Infrastructure and Economic Development Reform Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate: To Override The Veto (Y: 32 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: Overide Veto By The Governor (Y: 95 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: Adopt Free Conference Report (Y: 99 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: Grant Free Conference Powers (Y: 102 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Free Conference Report (Y: 32 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Motion To Invoke Cloture (Y: 24 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: To Grant Free Conference Powers (Y: 32 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 7 N: 107 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 33 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Rule 15a (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Adoption Of Committee Amendment (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate: To Set For Special Order (Y: 23 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 97 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25 Act No. 40
2017-05-19 Effective date See Act
2017-05-10SenateVeto overridden Ayes-32 Nays-12
2017-05-10HouseVeto overridden by originating body Yeas-95 Nays-18
2017-05-09 Vetoed by Governor
2017-05-09 Ratified R 51
2017-05-09HouseOrdered enrolled for ratification
2017-05-09HouseRoll call Yeas-99 Nays-20
2017-05-09HouseFree conference report adopted
2017-05-09HouseFree conference committee appointed Simrill, Rutherford, White
2017-05-09HouseRoll call Yeas-102 Nays-16
2017-05-09HouseFree conference powers granted
2017-05-08SenateRoll call Ayes-32 Nays-12
2017-05-08SenateFree conference report adopted
2017-05-08SenateFree conference committee appointed Sheheen, Campbell, Turner
2017-05-08SenateRoll call Ayes-32 Nays-11
2017-05-08SenateFree conference powers granted
2017-05-03HouseConference committee appointed Simrill, Rutherford, White
2017-05-03SenateSenate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Campbell, Sheheen, Turner
2017-05-03HouseRoll call Yeas-7 Nays-107
2017-05-03HouseNon-concurrence in Senate amendment
2017-04-27SenateRoll call Ayes-30 Nays-9
2017-04-27SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2017-04-26SenateRead second time
2017-04-26SenateAmended
2017-04-25SenateDebate interrupted
2017-04-25SenateAmended
2017-04-20SenateDebate interrupted
2017-04-19SenateDebate interrupted
2017-04-19SenateRoll call Ayes-21 Nays-17
2017-04-19SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2017-04-18SenateDebate interrupted
2017-04-06SenateDebate interrupted
2017-03-29SenateRoll call Ayes-23 Nays-18
2017-03-29SenateMotion For Special Order Failed
2017-03-16 Scrivener's error corrected
2017-03-15SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
2017-03-07 Scrivener's error corrected
2017-03-02 Scrivener's error corrected
2017-03-02SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2017-03-02SenateIntroduced and read first time
2017-03-02HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2017-03-01HouseRoll call Yeas-97 Nays-18
2017-03-01HouseRead second time
2017-03-01HouseAmended
2017-03-01HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Anderson
2017-02-28HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 3-1-17
2017-02-28HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Sottile
2017-02-23HouseDebate adjourned until Tues., 2-28-17
2017-02-23HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: King
2017-02-22HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hardee, Weeks
2017-02-21HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Davis, B.Newton, Anthony, Crosby, S.Rivers, Thigpen, Hosey, Murphy
2017-02-15HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Cogswell
2017-02-14HouseCommittee report: Majority favorable with amend., minority unfavorable Ways and Means
2017-02-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Daning
2017-02-09HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Clyburn
2017-02-07HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: J.E.Smith, Clemmons
2017-02-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder, Bernstein
2017-02-01HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Brown, Whipper, Cobb-Hunter
2017-01-31HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Martin, Spires, Funderburk, D.C.Moss
2017-01-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: V.S.Moss
2017-01-25HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson
2017-01-24HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Henegan, Ridgeway, Williams, Jefferson, Ott, Govan
2017-01-19HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Douglas, Knight, Erickson
2017-01-18HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2017-01-18HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0054 (Similar To) 2017-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Finance
S0384 (Similar To) 2017-02-08 - Referred to Committee on Finance
S0600 (Similar To) 2017-03-30 - Referred to Committee on Finance

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1111240(n/a)See Bill Text
1143165(n/a)See Bill Text
1143167(n/a)See Bill Text
12282355(n/a)See Bill Text
12282740(n/a)See Bill Text
1228310(n/a)See Bill Text
1228530(n/a)See Bill Text
12361710(n/a)See Bill Text
12362110(n/a)See Bill Text
12362120(n/a)See Bill Text
12362647(n/a)See Bill Text
1237220(n/a)See Bill Text
12372600(n/a)See Bill Text
12372610(n/a)See Bill Text
12372650(n/a)See Bill Text
1263330(n/a)See Bill Text
1263385(n/a)See Bill Text
1263632(n/a)See Bill Text
1263780(n/a)See Bill Text
5611410(n/a)See Bill Text
5611450(n/a)See Bill Text
563120(n/a)See Bill Text
563376(n/a)See Bill Text
563610(n/a)See Bill Text
563620(n/a)See Bill Text
563627(n/a)See Bill Text
563645(n/a)See Bill Text
563660(n/a)See Bill Text
571310(n/a)See Bill Text
571325(n/a)See Bill Text
571330(n/a)See Bill Text
571340(n/a)See Bill Text
571350(n/a)See Bill Text
571360(n/a)See Bill Text
571380(n/a)See Bill Text
571430(n/a)See Bill Text
571460(n/a)See Bill Text
571470(n/a)See Bill Text
571120(n/a)See Bill Text
5823620(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3516&session=122&summary=B
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3516_20170118.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3516_20170214.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3516_20170301.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3516_20170302.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3516_20170307.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3516_20170315.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3516_20170316.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3516_20170419.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3516_20170425.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3516_20170426.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3516_20170509.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=12527
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=12978
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=13250
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=13336
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=13337
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=13342
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=13380
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=13462
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=13471
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=13472
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=13475
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=13479
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=13535
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=13549

Bill Comments

feedback