SC S0054 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Phase In An Exemption Of A Percentage Of Manufacturing Property And Business Personal Property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

S.C. Infrastructure and Economic Development Reform Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2017-01-10SenateIntroduced and read first time
2016-12-13SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2016-12-13SenatePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H3516 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - Act No. 40
S0384 (Similar To) 2017-02-08 - Referred to Committee on Finance
S0600 (Similar To) 2017-03-30 - Referred to Committee on Finance
S0813 (Similar To) 2018-01-09 - Referred to Committee on Finance

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1228310(n/a)See Bill Text
12362110(n/a)See Bill Text
1237220(n/a)See Bill Text
1261140(n/a)See Bill Text
1263330(n/a)See Bill Text
1263385(n/a)See Bill Text
1263632(n/a)See Bill Text
126510(n/a)See Bill Text
126520(n/a)See Bill Text
561140(n/a)See Bill Text
5611410(n/a)See Bill Text
5611450(n/a)See Bill Text
563620(n/a)See Bill Text
563645(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback