SC S0384 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Define Terms, To Provide That The Article Does Not Apply To A Small Commercial Vehicle, To Provide That Certain Vehicles Are Assessed And Apportioned Based On A Road Use Fee Instead Of Property Taxes, To Provide That The Road Use Fee Is Due At The Same Time As Registration Fees, To Provide For The Distribution Of The Road Use Fee, And To Exempt Certain Semitrailers, Trailers, Large Commercial Motor Vehicles, And Buses From Ad Valorem Taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-08SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2017-02-08SenateIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0054 (Similar To) 2017-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Finance
S0600 (Similar To) 2017-03-30 - Referred to Committee on Finance
H3516 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - Act No. 40
S0813 (Similar To) 2018-01-09 - Referred to Committee on Finance

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1228310(n/a)See Bill Text
12362110(n/a)See Bill Text
5611410(n/a)See Bill Text
5611450(n/a)See Bill Text
563620(n/a)See Bill Text
563645(n/a)See Bill Text
571120(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback