SC S0555 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-19 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-19 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Approve Regulations Of The Department Of Labor, Licensing And Regulation - Board Of Nursing, Relating To Fees, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4510, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code.
Title
Nursing Board fees (D. No. 4510)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2015-03-19 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-1 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |