SC S0170 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 23-31-600, Relating To The Issuance Of Identification Cards To Qualified Retired Law Enforcement Officers, The Circumstances In Which A Qualified Law Enforcement Officer May Carry A Concealed Weapon, And Opportunities For Training To Qualify To Carry A Firearm That Must Be Offered To A Qualified Retired Law Enforcement Officer, So As To Delete The Provision That Restricts The Carrying Of A Concealed Weapon Onto Certain Premises.
Title
Law enforcement officers, retired ID issuance
Sponsors
Sen. Wes Climer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3407 (Similar To) 2023-01-31 - Scrivener's error corrected
H3408 (Similar To) 2023-01-31 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliam
H5013 (Similar To) 2024-03-19 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Willis
H3408 (Similar To) 2023-01-31 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliam
H5013 (Similar To) 2024-03-19 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Willis