SC S0016 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - Conference committee appointed Hembree, Turner, Stephens
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - Conference committee appointed Hembree, Turner, Stephens
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 59-29-17 So As To Require Completion Of Certain Basic Personal Finance Coursework For High School Graduation Instead Of Existing Economics Coursework Requirements, To Provide High Schools May Continue To Offer Such Coursework, To Provide For The Development And Content Of Related Standards, To Provide The State Department Of Education Shall Develop Related Measuring And Reporting Requirements And Shall Make Related Recommendations, And To Make These Provisions Applicable To Students Entering Ninth Grade Beginning With The 2022-2023 School Year; And To Repeal Section 59-29-165 Relating To Required Instruction In Personal Finance.
Title
Graduation requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Hembree, Turner, Stephens |
2022-02-23 | House | House insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. Allison, Felder, Henderson-Myers |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Non-concurrence in House amendment |
2022-02-16 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2022-02-15 | House | Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-0 |
2022-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-15 | House | Amended |
2022-02-08 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 2-15-22 |
2022-02-03 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 2-8-22 |
2022-01-27 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 2-3-22 |
2022-01-26 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 1-27-22 |
2022-01-20 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2021-02-24 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-1 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Amended |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2021-02-12 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3116 (Similar To) 2021-01-13 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pendarvis