SC H3116 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pendarvis
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 59-29-17 So As To Require A One-half Credit Course Of Study In Personal Finance With An End-of-course Examination As A Requirement For High School Graduation Beginning With The 2021-2022 School Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Graduation requirements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Pendarvis
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2020-12-09HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0016 (Similar To) 2021-02-25 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
592917(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback