SC H5339 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of United States Highway 178 From Its Intersection With United States Highway 15 To Its Intersection With United States Highway 78 In Dorchester County "mayor Charles William Ackerman Highway" And Erect Appropriate Signs Or Markers Along This Portion Of Highway Containing These Words.
Title
Charles William Ackerman Highway
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Jefferson [D] | Rep. Gilda Cobb-Hunter [D] | Rep. Christopher Murphy [R] | Rep. Fawn Pedalino [R] |
Rep. Gary Brewer [R] | Rep. Gil Gatch [R] | Rep. Robby Robbins [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-08 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-05-02 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2024-04-30 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-04-25 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2024-03-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2024-03-27 | House | Introduced |