SC H5154 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 58-5-1030, Relating To Civil Penalties, So As To Provide A Gas Utility Which Violates Section 58-5-1020 Or A Regulation Under Article 9 Of Chapter 5, Title 58 Is Subject To A Civil Penalty Not More Than The Civil Penalty Provided By 49 U.s.c. Section 60122 And 49 C.f.r. 190.233.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gas Utility Civil Penalty

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-02SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2024-04-02SenateIntroduced and read first time
2024-03-29HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2024-03-28HouseUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2024-03-28HouseRoll call Yeas-100 Nays-3
2024-03-28HouseRead second time
2024-03-27HouseCommittee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry
2024-02-27HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2024-02-27HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5851020(n/a)See Bill Text
5851030(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback