SC H4998 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-20 - Referred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Hutto, Matthews, Climer, Senn, Cash, Harpootlian
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-20 - Referred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Hutto, Matthews, Climer, Senn, Cash, Harpootlian
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Sections 61-4-10, 61-6-20, 61-6-30, 12-21-1010, 12-21-1030, And 12-33-245, All Relating To Alcoholic Beverages, So As To Consider Alcoholic Consumables The Same As Alcoholic Beverages And To Make Conforming Changes.
Title
Alcohol food products
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 66 N: 35 NV: 16 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House: Table Amendment 5 Amendment Number 5 (Y: 75 N: 27 NV: 15 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House: Table Amendment 4 Amendment Number 4 (Y: 60 N: 47 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House: Table Amendment 2 Amendment Number 2 (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 17 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 84 N: 26 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House: Table Amendment 5 Amendment Number 5 (Y: 75 N: 27 NV: 15 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House: Table Amendment 4 Amendment Number 4 (Y: 60 N: 47 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House: Table Amendment 2 Amendment Number 2 (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 17 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 84 N: 26 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Hutto, Matthews, Climer, Senn, Cash, Harpootlian |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-03-31 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2022-03-30 | House | Roll call Yeas-66 Nays-35 |
2022-03-30 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-30 | House | Amended |
2022-03-29 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2022-03-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Wooten |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2022-03-01 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Wetmore, W.Newton |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-02-22 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 21 | 1010 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 21 | 1030 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 33 | 245 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
61 | 4 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
61 | 6 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
61 | 6 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |